|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to HHH/HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 322) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 706) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 416) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 02-16-21 3:05PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:05PM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Re-Referred to HRE, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to HRE/HTH, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|