House
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 084, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 084, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 37-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 37-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Nakashima, LoPresti, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-22 9:15AM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Kitagawa, Nakashima Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 866).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 526).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1896-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-30-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1445-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 28) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-17-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2353) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio, Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-10-22 9:25AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-03-22 9:25AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 544) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, English, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to TRS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|