Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1211 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2021

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022
Bill February 19, 2021