Senate | 02/17/2022 | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-17-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 3:30PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Referred to TRS, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Introduced. |