Senate | 02/18/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Reported from AEN/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2610) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, DeCoite, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Referred to AEN/TRS, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | Pending Introduction. |