House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Wakai . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2002) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2001) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 01-27-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-24-22 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to LCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|