THE SENATE S.B. NO. 2018 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO MINIMUM WAGE. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII: THE SENATE S.B. NO. 2018 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 STATE OF HAWAII THE SENATE S.B. NO. 2018 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO MINIMUM WAGE. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII: SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (a) to read as follows: "(a) Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than: (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003; (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006; (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007; (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015; (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016; (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; [and] (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018[.]; (8) $12.00 per hour beginning October 1, 2022; (9) $15.00 per hour beginning January 1, 2024; and (10) $18.00 per hour beginning January 1, 2026." SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________ SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (a) to read as follows: "(a) Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than: (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003; (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006; (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007; (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015; (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016; (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; [and] (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018[.]; (8) $12.00 per hour beginning October 1, 2022; (9) $15.00 per hour beginning January 1, 2024; and (10) $18.00 per hour beginning January 1, 2026." SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________ INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________ Report Title: Minimum Wage; Increase Description: Increases the minimum wage for certain employees incrementally to $12.00 per hour beginning 10/1/2022, $15.00 per hour beginning 1/1/2024, and $18.00 per hour beginning 1/1/26. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent. Report Title: Minimum Wage; Increase Description: Increases the minimum wage for certain employees incrementally to $12.00 per hour beginning 10/1/2022, $15.00 per hour beginning 1/1/2024, and $18.00 per hour beginning 1/1/26. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.