House
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-22 10:20AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-28-22 at 7:15PM in Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-28-22 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-28-22 10:15AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Johanson, Marten Co-Chairs; Perruso, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Lee, Baker, Kanuha, Misalucha Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 866).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 532).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Har, D. Kobayashi, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Onishi, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1884-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Branco, Holt, B. Kobayashi, Sayama, Tam, Todd; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, D. Kobayashi, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Onishi voting no (6) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1439-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; 4 Noes: Representative(s) Har, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1152-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-17-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 162) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2892) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from EET/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2425) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Re-Referred to EET/TRS, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to EET/TRS, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|