Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2196 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Amended

Bill March 24, 2022
Bill March 18, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022