|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1038) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 170) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
One Day Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 918) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported from HMS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 49) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:01PM in conference room Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to HMS/PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|