Senate | 02/09/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2166) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 1:10PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to PSM, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |