Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 4:31PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 4:35PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 894).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Johanson Co-Chairs; Har, Tam, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 612).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1908-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-31-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1371-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 178) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2877) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2638) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Re-Referred to HTH, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to HTH/EDU, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|