Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2281 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 8, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022