House
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-17-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-17-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to JHA, CPC, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 68).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Lee). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
One Day Notice 03-04-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2745) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to JDC .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|