Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 72-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 72-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, LoPresti, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Gabbard, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Lowen, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Clark, LoPresti, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Gabbard, Wakai Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Deferred One Day 04-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 389).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1688-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1293-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:30AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1069-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, LoPresti, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Re-referred to TRN, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 25
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to TRN, WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 185) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3170) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-22 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from TRS/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2647) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to TRS/AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|