House
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1336-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1078-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 242) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2777) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-22 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2037) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-22 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to HMS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|