Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2481 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2022

Amended

Bill March 23, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022
Bill February 2, 2022