Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Marten Co-Chairs; Perruso, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Moriwaki, Misalucha Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 670).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2021-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1292-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:30AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 393) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3206) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-22 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2403) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to EET/GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|