Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2963 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2022

Amended

Bill April 9, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022
Bill March 5, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022