Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 875).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Lee, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 695).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Lowen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2020-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Todd; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1259-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Lowen, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 469) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2898) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2420) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio, Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-10-22 9:26AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|