Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB3189 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Amended

Bill April 9, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022