House
|
06/23/2022
|
Act 115, on 06/22/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Act 115, 06/22/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215).
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 959).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday 05-05-22.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Floor amendment adopted as amended CD 2 with none voting no and none excused.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Floor Amendment No. 8 offered by Rep. Luke.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 05-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Report filed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Separated Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Floor amendment adopted as amended (CD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Floor Amendment No. 13 offered.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 236-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 236-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-29-22 1:35PM; Conference Room 309.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Luke, Yamashita Co-Chairs; McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 875).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 580).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Floor amendment failed with Noes, 1 (Representative(s) Luke). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Floor Amendment No. 2 offered by Rep. Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1843-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Perruso, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:35PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-05-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to FIN, referral sheet 13
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 13) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-12-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 57) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 10:00AM in conference room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|