Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB514 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2021

Amended

Bill May 3, 2022
Bill April 30, 2022
Bill April 12, 2022
Bill April 8, 2022
Bill February 9, 2021