|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1454), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1100) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:15AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Referred to HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 23
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 429) in amended form (SD 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-11-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report filed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Separated Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Floor Amendment No. 2 offered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 722) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 210) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to HOU, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|