Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB607 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2021

Amended

Bill March 19, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021
Bill February 11, 2021