12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-21 9:31AM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Re-Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Referred to GVO, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |