House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 584).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Nakamura, Tarnas voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Takumi voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from LAT/FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1840-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Branco, B. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Okimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT/FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-22 11:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Re-referred to LAT/FIN, referral sheet 35
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 271) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 866) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 174) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 3:00PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|