Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB775 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2022
Bill April 1, 2022
Bill March 5, 2021
Bill February 11, 2021