12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Re-Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to EET. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 108) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to EET. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | The committee(s) on EET will hold a public decision making on 02-08-21 3:10PM in conference room 224. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Referred to EET. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Introduced. |