12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-12-21 10:05AM; CR211 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 33) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 3:00PM in conference room 229. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Referred to EDU, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |