Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 777).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-18-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Re-referred to CAI, referral sheet 52
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2067-22), recommending referral to HET.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Kapela, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 04-13-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Referred to CAI, HET, referral sheet 45
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 625).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3639) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to HRE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|