Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 779).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2156-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Re-referred to JHA, referral sheet 48
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 47
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 702) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-07-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3798) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to GVO.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|