House
|
04/08/2022
|
Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 47
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 708).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-07-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3783) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:40AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Report adopted, referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3520), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:25PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to HMS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|