Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 752).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, McKelvey, Ohno, Tokioka excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2129-22), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, Nishimoto, Wildberger, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2082-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Har.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 42
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 563).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
One Day Notice 03-31-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3526) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Referred to HTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Offered.
|
|
|