Senate | 06/06/2022 | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | One Day Notice 03-31-22. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3551) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred to EDU. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Offered. |