House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 1:30PM in conference room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 10:00AM in conference room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 10:00AM in conference room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-26-23 10:00AM in conference room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Kim Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 971).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Tarnas, Garrett Co-Chairs; Kapela, Martinez, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Re-referred to LGO, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 34
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 666).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 671) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1500) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1231) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to LBT, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 394).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1052) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 566) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|