Hawaii 2023 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1087 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Amended

Bill March 31, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023