Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Act 179, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
|
|
|
House
|
07/05/2023
|
Act 179, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 890).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Ganaden excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 873).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 721).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 687) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1600) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1296) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to HHS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 295).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Matsumoto, Pierick voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1096) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick voting no (3) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 389) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-09-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick voting no (3) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 101) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-03-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to HLT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|