Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to LBT, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 161).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1025), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 674) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Thursday, 02-16-23 11:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kapela voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 239) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ECD.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kapela; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:00AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 01-31-23 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to LGO, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|