Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1189) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 326).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1122) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 442), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 02-10-23 9:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|