Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Act 163, 06/30/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Act 163, on 06/30/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 135).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 135) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Yamashita, Evslin, Ilagan, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Nishimoto, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 3:00PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-28-23 2:00PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 880).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 982).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Conferees Added: Representatives Nishimoto, Nakamura, Morikawa, Ilagan added as Conferees.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 867).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Holt, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Evslin, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Pierick.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 884) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Ihara, Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Floor Amendment No. 3 offered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1780) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision made on 04-04-23 and will hold a public decision making on 04-05-2023 12:31 PM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-04-23 10:35AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 364).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1178) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 474) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-08-23 10:15AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|