House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 3:30PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 3:30PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 3:00PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Sayama, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 34
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 911).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Moriwaki.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 882).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 704).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2074), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1525) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-22-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HLT, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 333) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 853) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 547) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to HHS, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|