Senate | 02/17/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Reported from PSM/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 642) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 3:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Referred to PSM/EDU, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Pending Introduction. |