Senate | 02/23/2023 | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 28) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye, Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to TCA, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Introduced. |