House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Kim Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 598).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1914), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1561) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Morikawa, Ilagan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Wednesday, 03-22-23 3:00PM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 233) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 765) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Kidani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 202) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-07-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|