Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Act 149, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1252).
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Act 149, on 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1252).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 171) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 171).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Aiu, Tam, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 2:40PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 2:40PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 976).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Fukunaga, McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashimoto, Nakashima, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Aiu, Tam, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 748).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2130), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1535) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-21-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1302) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-15-23 9:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 243) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Richards. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 821) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-23-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|