House | 04/11/2023 | Referred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 28 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 652) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | One Day Notice 04-05-23. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported from PSM/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1581) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to PSM/HHS. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Offered. |