Senate | 05/22/2023 | Certified copies of resolutions sent. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | One Day Notice 04-04-23. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported from TCA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1490) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, McKelvey. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA/PSM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-23 3:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to TCA/PSM. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Offered. |