Senate | 05/22/2023 | Certified copies of resolutions sent. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | One Day Notice 04-05-23. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1634) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Re-Referred to HOU. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Referred to HOU/WAM. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Offered. |