12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/02/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima, Woodson excused (3). | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 15) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 01-31-23 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Prefiled. |